Changes related to "Gray Ajah (Positions)"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
24 September 2024
06:06 | Gray Ajah (Time Served) (diff | hist) . . (+83) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→Administrators: Ilverin is MPM) |
23 September 2024
06:26 | Graphics Development Team (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→Graphics Development Team Members: Ilverin off GDT) |
22 September 2024
07:45 | Ilverin Matriam (diff | hist) . . (+86) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (new MPM) |
21 September 2024
08:37 | Tower Gatekeeper (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Gatekeepers) |
20 September 2024
02:27 | Gray Ajah (Time Served) (diff | hist) . . (-8) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Staff) |
02:13 | Chat Operator (2 changes | history) . . (+139) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 02:13 (cur | prev) . . (+9) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
02:12 (cur | prev) . . (+130) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (position retired) |
02:04 | Arinna Katal (diff | hist) . . (-36) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (op end date) |
18 September 2024
01:19 | Gray Ajah (Time Served) (diff | hist) . . (-16) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
16 September 2024
10:23 | Gray Ajah (Time Served) (diff | hist) . . (-10) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Staff) |
10:21 | Arinna Katal (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (mod end date) |
10:17 | Moderator (2 changes | history) . . (+259) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
10:17 (cur | prev) . . (+22) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (Leira, Arinna and Morgana end dates) | ||
10:11 (cur | prev) . . (+237) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mods) |