Changes related to "San d'ma Shadar (Time Served)"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
3 October 2024
23:47 | Ty al'Djinn (diff | hist) . . (+33) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) (→Mentoring) |
23:37 | Alcyon Devrix (diff | hist) . . (+106) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) |
23 September 2024
06:26 | Graphics Development Team (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→Graphics Development Team Members: Ilverin off GDT) |
20 September 2024
02:20 | Time Served (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→By Department) |
02:13 | Chat Operator (2 changes | history) . . (+139) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 02:13 (cur | prev) . . (+9) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
02:12 (cur | prev) . . (+130) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (position retired) |
18 September 2024
01:12 | Template:CouncilRep (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
16 September 2024
10:17 | Moderator (2 changes | history) . . (+259) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
10:17 (cur | prev) . . (+22) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (Leira, Arinna and Morgana end dates) | ||
10:11 (cur | prev) . . (+237) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mods) |
11 September 2024
22:38 | Ty al'Djinn (2 changes | history) . . (-48) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 22:38 (cur | prev) . . (-29) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
22:10 (cur | prev) . . (-19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:36 | Brandon Tat'vakja (3 changes | history) . . (-56) . . [Tallan Daar (3×)] | |
m | 22:36 (cur | prev) . . (-29) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
22:06 (cur | prev) . . (-8) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | ||
22:05 (cur | prev) . . (-19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:34 | Template:Sitter (diff | hist) . . (-12) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:33 | Template:WC (diff | hist) . . (-12) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:02 | Template:CouncilRep (2 changes | history) . . (+2) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
22:02 (cur | prev) . . (-3) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | ||
21:59 (cur | prev) . . (+5) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21:59 | Time Served (diff | hist) . . (-115) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→By Position Level) |
21:50 | Hall of the Tower (TV) (diff | hist) . . (+2,637) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21:38 | (Move log) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) moved page Hall of Sitters and Warder Council to Hall of the Tower (TV) |
21:37 | (Deletion log) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) deleted page Hall of the Tower (TV) (content was: "==Overview== The Hall of the Tower ("the Hall") serves as a representative body of all members from TarValon.net, Inc membership groups providing representation, perspective, and advice to the Administration and/or Board of Directors on...") |