Changes related to "Retired Positions"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
1 October 2024
19:06 | Tallan Daar (diff | hist) . . (-93) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22 September 2024
00:30 | Tallan Daar (diff | hist) . . (-112) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21 September 2024
08:36 | Tallan Daar (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (staff roles end date) |
18 September 2024
16:39 | Jaryd Kosari (diff | hist) . . (-1,407) . . Jaryd Kosari (talk | contribs) (→{{greenheader2}} Tower Sworn Interview) |
16 September 2024
10:36 | Jaryd Kosari (diff | hist) . . (+118) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mod) |
15 September 2024
10:33 | Jenarra Tikvah (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (inactive) |
11 September 2024
22:10 | Tallan Daar (diff | hist) . . (-68) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |