Changes related to "Current Staff (Time Served)"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
23 September 2024
06:26 | Graphics Development Team (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→Graphics Development Team Members: Ilverin off GDT) |
01:31 | Current Positions (diff | hist) . . (-8) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→Department of Marketing: new MPM Ilverin and off the GDT) |
22 September 2024
07:46 | Marketing Project Manager (diff | hist) . . (+43) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→History: new MPM hire) |
07:45 | Ilverin Matriam (diff | hist) . . (+86) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (new MPM) |
00:30 | Tallan Daar (diff | hist) . . (-112) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21 September 2024
08:38 | Current Positions (diff | hist) . . (-35) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
08:37 | Tower Historian (diff | hist) . . (+19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Historians) |
08:37 | Tower Gatekeeper (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Gatekeepers) |
08:37 | City Council (diff | hist) . . (+16) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Members) |
08:36 | Tallan Daar (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (staff roles end date) |
20 September 2024
02:13 | Current Positions (diff | hist) . . (-111) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Other Positions) |
02:13 | Chat Operator (2 changes | history) . . (+139) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 02:13 (cur | prev) . . (+9) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
02:12 (cur | prev) . . (+130) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (position retired) |
02:07 | Nymala Ingasy (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (op end date) |
02:05 | Idine Espanyas (diff | hist) . . (-31) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (op end date) |
02:04 | Arinna Katal (diff | hist) . . (-36) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (op end date) |
02:03 | Alor Sionn (diff | hist) . . (+12) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (op end date) |