User contributions
From Tar Valon Library
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 22:07, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+15) . . Gray Merits (April 2024 update)
- 22:03, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+15) . . Dai M'Hael Merits (April 2024 update) (current)
- 22:01, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+67) . . Citizen Merits (April 2024 update) (current)
- 21:58, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . Brown Merits (April 2024 update) (current)
- 21:56, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . m Template:SM-S (current)
- 21:56, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . m Template:SM-P (current)
- 21:55, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . m Template:SM-G (current)
- 21:52, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+16) . . Blue Merits (April 2024 update)
- 21:50, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+143) . . N Template:SB-S (Social Butterfly mini template) (current)
- 21:43, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+25) . . Accepted Merits (April 2024 update)
- 21:41, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Template:KEA-G (current)
- 07:34, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+52) . . Accepted Merits
- 07:33, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (-52) . . Novice Merits
- 07:33, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Current Positions (Time Served)
- 07:33, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Current Staff (Time Served)
- 07:33, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Tower Initiates (Time Served)
- 07:32, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+30) . . 2024 Raisings (Elleria)
- 07:31, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Alexr al'Petros (→Mentoring)
- 07:31, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Anika Forsyn (→Mentoring)
- 07:31, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+40) . . Elleria Sevrinde (raised Accepted)
- 00:44, 10 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+2,243) . . Feros Sandulf (TS interview)
- 01:56, 9 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Executive Meeting (→2024 Executive Meetings)
- 00:08, 8 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (-12) . . Green Ajah (Time Served) (→Administrators)
- 00:07, 8 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (-26) . . Admin Positions (→Department of Research and Records)
- 00:07, 8 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (-83) . . Current Positions (Time Served) (→Administrators)
- 00:07, 8 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . Current Staff (Time Served) (→Administrators)
- 00:06, 8 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (-31) . . Department of Research and Records (Time Served) (→Administrators)
- 00:05, 8 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Dovienya el'Korim (→Previous)
- 00:05, 8 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Headmaster/Headmistress (→Headmasters/Headmistresses) (current)
- 00:05, 8 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . Department of Research and Records (Positions)
- 00:04, 8 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+68) . . Department of Research and Records (History) (→2024)
- 00:03, 8 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (-102) . . Department of Research and Records (→Administrators)
- 00:03, 8 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . Headmaster/Headmistress (Dovienya stepped down)
- 00:02, 8 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (-62) . . Dovienya el'Korim (stepped down as Headmistress)
- 21:28, 7 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+59) . . The Tower in 2023 (→Staff)
- 21:26, 7 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+260) . . The Tower in 2024 (Officer Awards)
- 21:25, 7 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+104) . . Tower Timeline
- 21:24, 7 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+185) . . Tower Timeline (→2023)
- 21:24, 7 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+91) . . Executive Meeting
- 21:21, 7 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+162) . . Tower Timeline (→2022)
- 21:20, 7 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Tower Timeline (→2014)
- 21:16, 7 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (-18) . . Tower Timeline (→2022)
- 21:15, 7 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+354) . . Tower Timeline (→2023)
- 19:23, 4 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+71) . . Thaddius al'Guy (TS interview categories)
- 02:39, 4 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Community Page: Green Ajah HQ (→{{greenheader2}} Official Positions)
- 02:35, 4 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . Community Page: Blue Ajah HQ (→How to Contact Us) (current)
- 02:34, 4 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Community Page: Gray Ajah HQ (→{{GrayHeader3}} What Gray Means To Us)
- 02:33, 4 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Ajahs and Companies (TarValon.Net) (→Companies) (current)
- 01:29, 4 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . m Shariyan Al'Feay
- 01:28, 4 April 2024 (diff | hist) . . (+7) . . m Aidana Astyanax
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)