Changes related to "Aintza Bisera"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
30 September 2024
08:24 | Community Page: Green Ajah HQ (3 changes | history) . . (-38) . . [Melisande Arneil (3×)] | |
08:24 (cur | prev) . . (0) . . Melisande Arneil (talk | contribs) (→{{greenheader2}} Official Positions) | ||
08:01 (cur | prev) . . (+5) . . Melisande Arneil (talk | contribs) (→{{greenheader2}} Official Positions) | ||
07:55 (cur | prev) . . (-43) . . Melisande Arneil (talk | contribs) (→{{greenheader2}} Site Positions) |
20 September 2024
02:12 | Chat Operator (diff | hist) . . (+130) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (position retired) |
16 September 2024
19:28 | The Bond (TarValon.Net) (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→By Year) |
10:35 | Elia LePhant (diff | hist) . . (+84) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mod) |
10:17 | Moderator (2 changes | history) . . (+259) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
10:17 (cur | prev) . . (+22) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (Leira, Arinna and Morgana end dates) | ||
10:11 (cur | prev) . . (+237) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mods) |
11 September 2024
22:07 | Elia LePhant (diff | hist) . . (-19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |