Changes related to "Khisanth al'Danya"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
20 September 2024
02:13 | Chat Operator (2 changes | history) . . (+139) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 02:13 (cur | prev) . . (+9) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
02:12 (cur | prev) . . (+130) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (position retired) |
16 September 2024
19:28 | The Bond (TarValon.Net) (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→By Year) |
19:23 | Cassie Dainar (diff | hist) . . (+154) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (bonded Ahmyra) |
15 September 2024
10:33 | Jenarra Tikvah (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (inactive) |
11 September 2024
22:34 | Template:Sitter (diff | hist) . . (-12) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21:50 | Hall of the Tower (TV) (diff | hist) . . (+2,637) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21:38 | (Move log) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) moved page Hall of Sitters and Warder Council to Hall of the Tower (TV) |
21:37 | (Deletion log) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) deleted page Hall of the Tower (TV) (content was: "==Overview== The Hall of the Tower ("the Hall") serves as a representative body of all members from TarValon.net, Inc membership groups providing representation, perspective, and advice to the Administration and/or Board of Directors on...") |