Changes related to "Amyrlin's Awards"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
22 September 2024
07:45 | Ilverin Matriam (diff | hist) . . (+86) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (new MPM) |
21 September 2024
08:37 | Tower Historian (diff | hist) . . (+19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Historians) |
20 September 2024
02:13 | Chat Operator (2 changes | history) . . (+139) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 02:13 (cur | prev) . . (+9) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
02:12 (cur | prev) . . (+130) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (position retired) |
02:04 | Arinna Katal (diff | hist) . . (-36) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (op end date) |
02:03 | Alor Sionn (diff | hist) . . (+12) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (op end date) |
18 September 2024
16:39 | Jaryd Kosari (diff | hist) . . (-1,407) . . Jaryd Kosari (talk | contribs) (→{{greenheader2}} Tower Sworn Interview) |
17 September 2024
17:19 | Melisande Arneil (diff | hist) . . (-21) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (BoD end date) |
17:18 | Rhed al'Tere (diff | hist) . . (+99) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (joined BoD) |
16 September 2024
19:23 | Cassie Dainar (diff | hist) . . (+154) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (bonded Ahmyra) |
10:36 | Jaryd Kosari (diff | hist) . . (+118) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mod) |
10:35 | Elia LePhant (diff | hist) . . (+84) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mod) |
10:31 | Alexr al'Petros (diff | hist) . . (+38) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mod) |
10:21 | Arinna Katal (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (mod end date) |
10:17 | Moderator (2 changes | history) . . (+259) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
10:17 (cur | prev) . . (+22) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (Leira, Arinna and Morgana end dates) | ||
10:11 (cur | prev) . . (+237) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mods) |
10:16 | Alor Sionn (diff | hist) . . (+38) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mod) |
11 September 2024
22:37 | Kelgan al'Moranwin (2 changes | history) . . (-48) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 22:37 (cur | prev) . . (-29) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
22:07 (cur | prev) . . (-19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:37 | Elia LePhant (2 changes | history) . . (-48) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 22:37 (cur | prev) . . (-29) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
22:07 (cur | prev) . . (-19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:36 | Cahalan Sothron (2 changes | history) . . (-38) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 22:36 (cur | prev) . . (-29) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
22:06 (cur | prev) . . (-9) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:36 | Branwyn al'Leara (2 changes | history) . . (-52) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 22:36 (cur | prev) . . (-29) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
22:06 (cur | prev) . . (-23) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:36 | Brandon Tat'vakja (3 changes | history) . . (-56) . . [Tallan Daar (3×)] | |
m | 22:36 (cur | prev) . . (-29) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
22:06 (cur | prev) . . (-8) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | ||
22:05 (cur | prev) . . (-19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:35 | Alor Sionn (2 changes | history) . . (-48) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 22:35 (cur | prev) . . (-29) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
22:05 (cur | prev) . . (-19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:35 | Alexr al'Petros (2 changes | history) . . (-67) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 22:35 (cur | prev) . . (-29) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
22:05 (cur | prev) . . (-38) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:35 | Ilverin Matriam (2 changes | history) . . (-48) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 22:35 (cur | prev) . . (-29) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
22:07 (cur | prev) . . (-19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:34 | Template:Sitter (diff | hist) . . (-12) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21:50 | Hall of the Tower (TV) (diff | hist) . . (+2,637) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21:38 | (Move log) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) moved page Hall of Sitters and Warder Council to Hall of the Tower (TV) |
21:37 | (Deletion log) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) deleted page Hall of the Tower (TV) (content was: "==Overview== The Hall of the Tower ("the Hall") serves as a representative body of all members from TarValon.net, Inc membership groups providing representation, perspective, and advice to the Administration and/or Board of Directors on...") |
10 September 2024
11:50 | Alexr al'Petros (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Mentoring) |
11:50 | Tree (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Mentoring) |
8 September 2024
19:57 | Alexr al'Petros (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Mentoring) |
1 September 2024
20:34 | Alor Sionn (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Mentoring) |