Changes related to "Department of Technology (History)"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
3 October 2024
23:59 | Fenya al'Caem (diff | hist) . . (+33) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) (→Mentoring) |
21 September 2024
08:37 | Tower Gatekeeper (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Gatekeepers) |
20 September 2024
02:13 | Chat Operator (2 changes | history) . . (+139) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 02:13 (cur | prev) . . (+9) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
02:12 (cur | prev) . . (+130) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (position retired) |
18 September 2024
16:39 | Jaryd Kosari (diff | hist) . . (-1,407) . . Jaryd Kosari (talk | contribs) (→{{greenheader2}} Tower Sworn Interview) |
16 September 2024
10:36 | Jaryd Kosari (diff | hist) . . (+118) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mod) |
10:17 | Moderator (2 changes | history) . . (+259) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
10:17 (cur | prev) . . (+22) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (Leira, Arinna and Morgana end dates) | ||
10:11 (cur | prev) . . (+237) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mods) |