Changes related to "Amyrlin's Awards"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
22 September 2024
07:45 | Ilverin Matriam (diff | hist) . . (+86) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (new MPM) |
21 September 2024
08:37 | Tower Historian (diff | hist) . . (+19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Historians) |
20 September 2024
02:13 | Chat Operator (2 changes | history) . . (+139) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 02:13 (cur | prev) . . (+9) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
02:12 (cur | prev) . . (+130) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (position retired) |
02:04 | Arinna Katal (diff | hist) . . (-36) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (op end date) |
02:03 | Alor Sionn (diff | hist) . . (+12) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (op end date) |
18 September 2024
16:39 | Jaryd Kosari (diff | hist) . . (-1,407) . . Jaryd Kosari (talk | contribs) (→{{greenheader2}} Tower Sworn Interview) |
17 September 2024
17:19 | Melisande Arneil (diff | hist) . . (-21) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (BoD end date) |
17:18 | Rhed al'Tere (diff | hist) . . (+99) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (joined BoD) |
16 September 2024
19:23 | Cassie Dainar (diff | hist) . . (+154) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (bonded Ahmyra) |