Changes related to "Brown Ajah (Time Served)"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
23 September 2024
06:26 | Graphics Development Team (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→Graphics Development Team Members: Ilverin off GDT) |
22 September 2024
00:30 | Tallan Daar (diff | hist) . . (-112) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21 September 2024
08:37 | Tower Historian (diff | hist) . . (+19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Historians) |
08:37 | Tower Gatekeeper (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Gatekeepers) |
08:37 | City Council (diff | hist) . . (+16) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Members) |
08:36 | Tallan Daar (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (staff roles end date) |
20 September 2024
02:20 | Time Served (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→By Department) |
02:13 | Chat Operator (2 changes | history) . . (+139) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 02:13 (cur | prev) . . (+9) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
02:12 (cur | prev) . . (+130) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (position retired) |
17 September 2024
17:18 | Rhed al'Tere (diff | hist) . . (+99) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (joined BoD) |
16 September 2024
10:35 | Elia LePhant (diff | hist) . . (+84) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mod) |
10:25 | Leira Galene (diff | hist) . . (-46) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (mod end date) |
10:17 | Moderator (2 changes | history) . . (+259) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
10:17 (cur | prev) . . (+22) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (Leira, Arinna and Morgana end dates) | ||
10:11 (cur | prev) . . (+237) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mods) |