Changes related to "Staff Positions"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
23 September 2024
06:26 | Graphics Development Team (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→Graphics Development Team Members: Ilverin off GDT) |
01:31 | Current Positions (diff | hist) . . (-8) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→Department of Marketing: new MPM Ilverin and off the GDT) |
01:29 | Admin Positions (diff | hist) . . (+13) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→Department of Marketing: new MPM hire) |
21 September 2024
08:38 | Current Positions (diff | hist) . . (-35) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
08:37 | Tower Historian (diff | hist) . . (+19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Historians) |
08:37 | Tower Gatekeeper (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Gatekeepers) |
08:37 | City Council (diff | hist) . . (+16) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Members) |
20 September 2024
02:13 | Current Positions (diff | hist) . . (-111) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Other Positions) |
02:12 | Chat Operator (diff | hist) . . (+130) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (position retired) |
18 September 2024
01:12 | Template:CouncilRep (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
16 September 2024
10:49 | Current Positions (diff | hist) . . (+36) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Other Positions) |
10:17 | Moderator (2 changes | history) . . (+259) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
10:17 (cur | prev) . . (+22) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (Leira, Arinna and Morgana end dates) | ||
10:11 (cur | prev) . . (+237) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mods) |
11 September 2024
22:34 | Template:Sitter (diff | hist) . . (-12) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:33 | Template:WC (diff | hist) . . (-12) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:02 | Template:CouncilRep (2 changes | history) . . (+2) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
22:02 (cur | prev) . . (-3) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | ||
21:59 (cur | prev) . . (+5) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21:50 | Hall of the Tower (TV) (diff | hist) . . (+2,637) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21:37 | (Deletion log) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) deleted page Hall of the Tower (TV) (content was: "==Overview== The Hall of the Tower ("the Hall") serves as a representative body of all members from TarValon.net, Inc membership groups providing representation, perspective, and advice to the Administration and/or Board of Directors on...") |