Changes related to "Blue Ajah (Time Served)"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
23 September 2024
06:26 | Graphics Development Team (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→Graphics Development Team Members: Ilverin off GDT) |
22 September 2024
07:46 | Marketing Project Manager (diff | hist) . . (+43) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→History: new MPM hire) |
21 September 2024
08:37 | Tower Historian (diff | hist) . . (+19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Historians) |
08:37 | Tower Gatekeeper (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Gatekeepers) |
08:37 | City Council (diff | hist) . . (+16) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Members) |
20 September 2024
02:20 | Time Served (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→By Department) |
02:12 | Chat Operator (diff | hist) . . (+130) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (position retired) |
02:07 | Nymala Ingasy (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (op end date) |
18 September 2024
01:12 | Template:CouncilRep (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
17 September 2024
18:25 | Ruslan Rynar (diff | hist) . . (+62) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) (→Current) |