Changes related to "Blue Ajah (Time Served)"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
23 September 2024
06:26 | Graphics Development Team (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→Graphics Development Team Members: Ilverin off GDT) |
22 September 2024
07:46 | Marketing Project Manager (diff | hist) . . (+43) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→History: new MPM hire) |
21 September 2024
08:37 | Tower Historian (diff | hist) . . (+19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Historians) |
08:37 | Tower Gatekeeper (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Gatekeepers) |
08:37 | City Council (diff | hist) . . (+16) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Members) |
20 September 2024
02:20 | Time Served (diff | hist) . . (+5) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→By Department) |
02:12 | Chat Operator (diff | hist) . . (+130) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (position retired) |
02:07 | Nymala Ingasy (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (op end date) |
18 September 2024
01:12 | Template:CouncilRep (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
17 September 2024
18:25 | Ruslan Rynar (diff | hist) . . (+62) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) (→Current) |
16 September 2024
10:47 | Nymala Ingasy (diff | hist) . . (-22) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mod) |
10:28 | Morgana Arakos (diff | hist) . . (-120) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (mod end date) |
10:17 | Moderator (2 changes | history) . . (+259) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
10:17 (cur | prev) . . (+22) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (Leira, Arinna and Morgana end dates) | ||
10:11 (cur | prev) . . (+237) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mods) |
11 September 2024
22:34 | Template:Sitter (diff | hist) . . (-12) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:33 | Template:WC (diff | hist) . . (-12) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:08 | Lyndo Shiranui (diff | hist) . . (-71) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:06 | Cahalan Sothron (diff | hist) . . (-9) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:02 | Template:CouncilRep (2 changes | history) . . (+2) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
22:02 (cur | prev) . . (-3) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | ||
21:59 (cur | prev) . . (+5) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21:59 | Time Served (diff | hist) . . (-115) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→By Position Level) |
21:50 | Hall of the Tower (TV) (diff | hist) . . (+2,637) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21:37 | (Deletion log) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) deleted page Hall of the Tower (TV) (content was: "==Overview== The Hall of the Tower ("the Hall") serves as a representative body of all members from TarValon.net, Inc membership groups providing representation, perspective, and advice to the Administration and/or Board of Directors on...") |
8 September 2024
19:56 | Lyndo Shiranui (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Mentoring) |