User contributions
From Tar Valon Library
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 10:59, 28 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+32) . . Aintza Bisera (→Mentoring)
- 10:58, 28 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+46) . . Atane Valthon (→Mentoring)
- 02:03, 28 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+31) . . Calen Velervron (→Mentoring)
- 02:02, 28 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+45) . . Ael Nisrathe (→Mentoring)
- 07:26, 27 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+54) . . Sorcha Al'Verdan (missing mod service)
- 04:05, 27 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+36) . . m Retired Positions (because um yeah)
- 04:04, 27 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-62) . . Tower Archivist (Redirected page to Archivist) (current)
- 04:01, 27 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+57) . . m Department of Community Outreach (Positions) (added link)
- 04:00, 27 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-45) . . m Tallan Daar (→Previous)
- 04:00, 27 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-45) . . m Nymala Ingasy (→Previous)
- 03:59, 27 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+942) . . N Assistant to the Director of Community Outreach (lack of position page) (current)
- 13:45, 26 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . File:KitanSquare.jpg (Tallan Daar uploaded a new version of File:KitanSquare.jpg) (current)
- 08:55, 26 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-71) . . Lucas al'Baine (old other Tower relationship)
- 07:31, 26 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-66) . . Jeryn Lekar (no longer CC, whoops)
- 07:19, 26 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+60) . . Willow Elbereth (added to staff categories)
- 07:18, 26 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-60) . . Venric Methalion (removed former staff categories)
- 23:35, 25 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+37) . . Category:Da'Covale Auctions (let's either put something in here or remove it) (current)
- 13:26, 25 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . m Administrative and Staff Positions in 2020 (removed year)
- 13:25, 25 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . Current Staff (Time Served) (Jeryn -> Venric)
- 13:24, 25 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Venric Methalion (most recent position at the top)
- 06:42, 25 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+590) . . N Ael Nisrathe (Created page with "{{Template:JuniorMemberInfo |Avatar=Avatar Ael.jpg |TowerName=Ael Nisrathe |RealName= |Location={{US}} |Birthday= |Affiliation= |TowerRank={{recruit}} |TowerTitle= |JoinDate=O...")
- 06:41, 25 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+44) . . N File:Avatar Ael.jpg (Category:Avatars Category:JM Avatars)
- 16:16, 24 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . m Survey Project Manager (just making it look the same)
- 16:14, 24 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+83) . . N Category:Former Department of Administration Positions (missing category) (current)
- 09:13, 24 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Department of Community Outreach Staff (tense change)
- 06:06, 24 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-4) . . m Editing Merit (name change)
- 06:02, 24 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (-41) . . Library Editors (Aleita's account is no longer unused :p)
- 05:57, 24 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . Eniara Kisharad (no longer an active Editor)
- 05:56, 24 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . Lithiel Morn (no longer an active Editor)
- 13:58, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+285) . . Bondmates of the Gray Ajah
- 13:51, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+84) . . Community Page: Yellow Bondmates
- 13:49, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+20) . . VC Aes Sedai (→The Yellow Aes Sedai)
- 13:49, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+185) . . Bonding Table
- 13:47, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+175) . . Bonding Dates (Dreia bond)
- 13:47, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+176) . . Bonding Dates (Idine bond)
- 13:46, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+126) . . 2020 Bondings
- 13:45, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+135) . . Idine Espanyas (bond)
- 13:44, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+136) . . Dreia Raieese (bond)
- 13:10, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+19) . . VC Aes Sedai (→The Gray Aes Sedai)
- 13:09, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+178) . . Bonding Table (new bond)
- 13:08, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+170) . . Bonding Dates (Madhar bond)
- 13:07, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+172) . . Bonding Dates (Siera bond)
- 13:06, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+153) . . 2020 Bondings (new bond)
- 13:05, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+130) . . Madhar al'Thera (bond)
- 13:04, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+140) . . Siera al'Cere (bond)
- 00:46, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+80) . . Citizen Contributors and Attendees (added Melorea)
- 00:45, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+4) . . m Tar Valon Times (added page link for Melorea)
- 00:45, 23 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+48) . . N Melorea al'Taehor (Redirected page to Citizen Contributors and Attendees)
- 09:24, 22 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Community Page: Mahdi'in d'ma Dieb HQ (→Current Leadership)
- 01:55, 22 November 2020 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . Department of Membership (Positions) (→Staff)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)