Changes related to "Caerwyn Jolan"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
3 October 2024
23:59 | Gedhan Audax (diff | hist) . . (+33) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) (→Mentoring) |
20 September 2024
02:13 | Chat Operator (2 changes | history) . . (+139) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 02:13 (cur | prev) . . (+9) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
02:12 (cur | prev) . . (+130) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (position retired) |
17 September 2024
17:16 | Board of Directors (4 changes | history) . . (+83) . . [Tallan Daar; Toral Delvar (3×)] | |
m | 17:16 (cur | prev) . . (+1) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Current Members) | |
13:20 (cur | prev) . . (+68) . . Toral Delvar (talk | contribs) | ||
10:49 (cur | prev) . . (+7) . . Toral Delvar (talk | contribs) | ||
10:48 (cur | prev) . . (+7) . . Toral Delvar (talk | contribs) |
16 September 2024
19:28 | The Bond (TarValon.Net) (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→By Year) |
11 September 2024
22:33 | Template:WC (diff | hist) . . (-12) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21:50 | Hall of the Tower (TV) (diff | hist) . . (+2,637) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21:38 | (Move log) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) moved page Hall of Sitters and Warder Council to Hall of the Tower (TV) |
21:37 | (Deletion log) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) deleted page Hall of the Tower (TV) (content was: "==Overview== The Hall of the Tower ("the Hall") serves as a representative body of all members from TarValon.net, Inc membership groups providing representation, perspective, and advice to the Administration and/or Board of Directors on...") |