Changes related to "2010 Annual Report"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
3 October 2024
23:59 | Gedhan Audax (diff | hist) . . (+33) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) (→Mentoring) |
30 September 2024
08:24 | Community Page: Green Ajah HQ (3 changes | history) . . (-38) . . [Melisande Arneil (3×)] | |
08:24 (cur | prev) . . (0) . . Melisande Arneil (talk | contribs) (→{{greenheader2}} Official Positions) | ||
08:01 (cur | prev) . . (+5) . . Melisande Arneil (talk | contribs) (→{{greenheader2}} Official Positions) | ||
07:55 (cur | prev) . . (-43) . . Melisande Arneil (talk | contribs) (→{{greenheader2}} Site Positions) |
22 September 2024
07:45 | Ilverin Matriam (diff | hist) . . (+86) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (new MPM) |
21 September 2024
08:37 | Tower Historian (diff | hist) . . (+19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Historians) |
20 September 2024
02:13 | Chat Operator (2 changes | history) . . (+139) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 02:13 (cur | prev) . . (+9) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
02:12 (cur | prev) . . (+130) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (position retired) |
18 September 2024
16:39 | Jaryd Kosari (diff | hist) . . (-1,407) . . Jaryd Kosari (talk | contribs) (→{{greenheader2}} Tower Sworn Interview) |
17 September 2024
17:19 | Melisande Arneil (diff | hist) . . (-21) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (BoD end date) |
17:16 | Board of Directors (4 changes | history) . . (+83) . . [Tallan Daar; Toral Delvar (3×)] | |
m | 17:16 (cur | prev) . . (+1) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Current Members) | |
13:20 (cur | prev) . . (+68) . . Toral Delvar (talk | contribs) | ||
10:49 (cur | prev) . . (+7) . . Toral Delvar (talk | contribs) | ||
10:48 (cur | prev) . . (+7) . . Toral Delvar (talk | contribs) |
16 September 2024
19:23 | Cassie Dainar (diff | hist) . . (+154) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (bonded Ahmyra) |
10:36 | Jaryd Kosari (diff | hist) . . (+118) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mod) |
10:35 | Elia LePhant (diff | hist) . . (+84) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mod) |
11 September 2024
22:37 | Elia LePhant (2 changes | history) . . (-48) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 22:37 (cur | prev) . . (-29) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
22:07 (cur | prev) . . (-19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:36 | Branwyn al'Leara (2 changes | history) . . (-52) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 22:36 (cur | prev) . . (-29) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
22:06 (cur | prev) . . (-23) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:36 | Amarande al'Kalin (2 changes | history) . . (-48) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 22:36 (cur | prev) . . (-29) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
22:05 (cur | prev) . . (-19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:35 | Ilverin Matriam (2 changes | history) . . (-48) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 22:35 (cur | prev) . . (-29) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
22:07 (cur | prev) . . (-19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
22:04 | Who's Who (diff | hist) . . (-66) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Within the Administration) |
21:38 | (Move log) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) moved page Hall of Sitters and Warder Council to Hall of the Tower (TV) |