User contributions
From Tar Valon Library
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 11:02, 5 January 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+47) . . Alenya Al'Roran (Added Yelenia as Mentor.)
- 11:00, 5 January 2019 (diff | hist) . . (+33) . . Yelenia Hylraren (Added Alenya as mentee.)
- 13:16, 10 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1,360) . . The Tower in 2009
- 14:42, 7 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+21) . . The Tower in 2005
- 14:41, 7 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+21) . . The Tower in 2006
- 14:41, 7 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+21) . . The Tower in 2007
- 14:40, 7 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+767) . . The Tower in 2008
- 14:26, 7 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1,104) . . The Tower in 2007
- 14:05, 7 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+17) . . The Tower in 2005
- 14:05, 7 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+28) . . The Tower in 2006
- 14:03, 7 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1,608) . . The Tower in 2006
- 13:05, 6 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+684) . . The Tower in 2005
- 12:47, 6 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1,056) . . The Tower in 2004
- 12:26, 6 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . The Tower in 2003
- 12:24, 6 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+530) . . The Tower in 2003
- 13:05, 4 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+7) . . The Tower in 2002
- 12:56, 4 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+719) . . The Tower in 2002
- 11:00, 2 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+34) . . N User:Elia LePhant (Created page with "Who's Who Profile") (current)
- 10:50, 2 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Tower Timeline (Punctuation errors.)
- 10:21, 2 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . Eluial Aldaran (Updated Welcome Committee position.)
- 10:18, 2 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-60) . . Eliza Al'Shaw (Welcome Committee updates.)
- 10:17, 2 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-23) . . Fern al'Thorn
- 10:15, 2 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+32) . . Jarl Lewin
- 10:14, 2 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+32) . . M. C.
- 10:14, 2 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-70) . . Lithiel Morn
- 10:12, 2 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+9) . . Lithiel Morn
- 10:10, 2 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+56) . . M. C. (Added Welcome Committee position.)
- 10:09, 2 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+56) . . Jarl Lewin (Added Welcoming Committee position.)
- 10:07, 2 December 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+224) . . City Council (Updated new WC roster.)
- 12:48, 29 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+97) . . m Tower Timeline
- 12:45, 29 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+1,315) . . Tower Timeline (Added sections for 2016, 2017, and 2018.)
- 12:02, 29 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . m Community Page: Brown Ajah Positions (Added start date for Elia LePhant as Brown Mind.)
- 12:00, 29 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+6) . . m Officially Unofficial (Added start date for Elia LePhant as Brown Mind.)
- 14:26, 28 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+52) . . Reniel Killan
- 14:21, 28 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+16) . . Master/Mistress of Revels (Britain and Ireland) (current)
- 14:20, 28 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+7) . . Master/Mistress of Revels (Continental Europe) (Changes to Categories.)
- 14:19, 28 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-29) . . Master/Mistress of Revels (Europe) (Updated Reniel's tenure date.)
- 10:52, 28 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Master/Mistress of Revels (Europe) (Fixed categories.)
- 10:45, 28 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+209) . . Master/Mistress of Revels (Europe) (Added to history to reflect changes to position.)
- 10:40, 28 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+15) . . Master/Mistress of Revels (Continental Europe) (Retired position.)
- 10:34, 28 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+267) . . Master/Mistress of Revels (Britain and Ireland) (Retired position.)
- 11:31, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+47) . . Rhed al'Tere (Added Keeper's Award)
- 11:29, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+50) . . Tallan Daar (Added Keeper's Award)
- 11:28, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+66) . . Jeffan Caliarthan (Added Keeper's Award)
- 11:26, 27 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+62) . . Barmacral Tigana (Added Keeper's Award)
- 09:52, 24 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+3) . . Shatayan (TarValon.Net) (Format change.)
- 10:43, 21 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . Cynayne Nilonne (Updated to current avatar.)
- 10:41, 21 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+44) . . File:CynaneNilonne.jpg
- 10:39, 21 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . N File:CynaneNilonne.jpg
- 10:16, 21 November 2018 (diff | hist) . . (+73) . . Leala ni al'Dareis t'al'Caleum (Added SM Interview Categories.)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)