Changes related to "Current Staff (Time Served)"
From Tar Valon Library
This is a list of changes made recently to pages linked from a specified page (or to members of a specified category). Pages on your watchlist are bold.
3 October 2024
23:59 | Fenya al'Caem (diff | hist) . . (+33) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) (→Mentoring) |
23:58 | Willow al'Meana (diff | hist) . . (+80) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) (→Mentoring) |
23:54 | Roheryn ni Galghandhrei t'al'Djinn (diff | hist) . . (+28) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) (→Mentoring) |
23:47 | Ty al'Djinn (diff | hist) . . (+33) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) (→Mentoring) |
23:37 | Alcyon Devrix (diff | hist) . . (+106) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) |
23:34 | Dovienya el'Korim (2 changes | history) . . (+122) . . [Bryher al'Venna (2×)] | |
23:34 (cur | prev) . . (+38) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) | ||
23:32 (cur | prev) . . (+84) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) (→Bonding) |
1 October 2024
19:06 | Tallan Daar (diff | hist) . . (-93) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
30 September 2024
08:31 | Cordamora (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . Toral Delvar (talk | contribs) |
08:24 | Community Page: Green Ajah HQ (3 changes | history) . . (-38) . . [Melisande Arneil (3×)] | |
08:24 (cur | prev) . . (0) . . Melisande Arneil (talk | contribs) (→{{greenheader2}} Official Positions) | ||
08:01 (cur | prev) . . (+5) . . Melisande Arneil (talk | contribs) (→{{greenheader2}} Official Positions) | ||
07:55 (cur | prev) . . (-43) . . Melisande Arneil (talk | contribs) (→{{greenheader2}} Site Positions) |
27 September 2024
17:22 | Willow al'Meana (2 changes | history) . . (+50) . . [Bryher al'Venna (2×)] | |
17:22 (cur | prev) . . (+11) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) | ||
17:19 (cur | prev) . . (+39) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) (→Tower History) |
23 September 2024
06:26 | Graphics Development Team (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→Graphics Development Team Members: Ilverin off GDT) |
01:31 | Current Positions (diff | hist) . . (-8) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→Department of Marketing: new MPM Ilverin and off the GDT) |
22 September 2024
07:46 | Marketing Project Manager (diff | hist) . . (+43) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (→History: new MPM hire) |
07:45 | Ilverin Matriam (diff | hist) . . (+86) . . Ilverin Matriam (talk | contribs) (new MPM) |
00:30 | Tallan Daar (diff | hist) . . (-112) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
21 September 2024
08:38 | Current Positions (diff | hist) . . (-35) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
08:37 | Tower Historian (diff | hist) . . (+19) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Historians) |
08:37 | Tower Gatekeeper (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Gatekeepers) |
08:37 | City Council (diff | hist) . . (+16) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Members) |
08:36 | Tallan Daar (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (staff roles end date) |
20 September 2024
02:13 | Current Positions (diff | hist) . . (-111) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Other Positions) |
02:13 | Chat Operator (2 changes | history) . . (+139) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 02:13 (cur | prev) . . (+9) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) | |
02:12 (cur | prev) . . (+130) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (position retired) |
02:07 | Nymala Ingasy (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (op end date) |
02:05 | Idine Espanyas (diff | hist) . . (-31) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (op end date) |
02:04 | Arinna Katal (diff | hist) . . (-36) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (op end date) |
02:03 | Alor Sionn (diff | hist) . . (+12) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (op end date) |
18 September 2024
m 01:13 | Phen al'Rohan (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Current) |
m 01:13 | Nimeroni Quilana (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Current) |
m 01:13 | Kranerian Vrammar (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Current) |
m 01:13 | Jorell al'Racha (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Current) |
N 01:12 | Template:HallRep (diff | hist) . . (+96) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (Created page with "Hall Representative<noinclude>Category:Role Templates</noinclude>") |
01:12 | Template:CouncilRep (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) |
17 September 2024
18:25 | Ruslan Rynar (diff | hist) . . (+62) . . Bryher al'Venna (talk | contribs) (→Current) |
17:19 | Calen Velervron (2 changes | history) . . (-21) . . [Tallan Daar (2×)] | |
m | 17:19 (cur | prev) . . (0) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Previous) | |
17:18 (cur | prev) . . (-21) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (BoD end date) |
16 September 2024
19:24 | Ahmyra Cova Souvraya (diff | hist) . . (+116) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (bonded Cassie) |
19:23 | Cassie Dainar (diff | hist) . . (+154) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (bonded Ahmyra) |
10:49 | Current Positions (diff | hist) . . (+36) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (→Other Positions) |
10:47 | Nymala Ingasy (diff | hist) . . (-22) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mod) |
10:35 | Elia LePhant (diff | hist) . . (+84) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mod) |
10:31 | Alexr al'Petros (diff | hist) . . (+38) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mod) |
10:25 | Leira Galene (diff | hist) . . (-46) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (mod end date) |
10:21 | Arinna Katal (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (mod end date) |
10:17 | Moderator (diff | hist) . . (+22) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (Leira, Arinna and Morgana end dates) |
10:16 | Alor Sionn (diff | hist) . . (+38) . . Tallan Daar (talk | contribs) (new mod) |